Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/12/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/12/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/12/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/18/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/16/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/16/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/16/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/16/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/15/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/15/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/15/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/13/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/13/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/13/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/13/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/13/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/13/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/13/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/18/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/18/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/18/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/18/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/18/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/18/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/19/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/19/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/19/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/19/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/19/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/19/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/19/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/19/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/19/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/20/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/20/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/20/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/21/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/21/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/21/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/21/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/21/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/21/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/21/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/21/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/21/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/21/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/25/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 10/25/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/25/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/25/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/27/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/27/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/27/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/28/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/28/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/28/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/03/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/03/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/03/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/04/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/04/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/04/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/04/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/04/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/09/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/08/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/14/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/14/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2000