Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/20/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/20/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/20/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/20/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/20/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/20/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/20/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/20/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/20/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/20/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/07/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/07/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/07/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/07/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/07/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/07/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/07/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/07/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/14/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/14/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/14/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/14/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/14/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/14/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/14/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/14/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/14/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/14/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/14/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/14/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/14/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/14/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/14/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/14/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/14/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/14/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/14/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/14/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/29/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/29/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/29/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/29/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/29/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/29/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/29/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/01/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 07/01/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/19/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/19/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/19/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/19/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/19/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 08/05/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 08/05/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 08/05/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 08/05/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/05/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/15/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/15/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/15/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/15/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/15/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/24/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/14/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/14/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/26/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/26/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/26/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/26/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/26/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/26/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/16/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/16/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/10/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/10/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/21/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/21/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/21/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/21/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/28/2000