There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Chemical Safety Information and Site Security Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for public disclosure of accidental release scenario information in risk management plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/13/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
09/24/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/26/1999Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
05/21/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
05/19/1999Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
05/17/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
05/13/1999Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/1999Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/1999Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/1999Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce05/13/1999 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/17/1999 Referred to
05/26/1999 Hearings by
House Government Reform05/13/1999 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology05/21/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary05/13/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime09/24/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1790.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1790. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/1999)

Chemical Safety Information and Site Security Act of 1999 - Prohibits off-site consequence analysis information (portions of risk management plans submitted by certain stationary sources under the Clean Air Act evaluating worst-case or alternative scenario accidental releases of extremely hazardous substances) from being available under Federal freedom of information provisions.

Bars Federal employees from making such information available in an electronic form, except as otherwise provided by this Act.

Authorizes the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to make such information available in an electronic form to State or local government employees for official use only. Directs the Administrator, in response to any request for such information, including requests for risk management plans, to provide such information but only in paper form. Permits the Administrator, at the request of a State or local government officer, to provide information submitted for the stationary sources in the State in which such officer serves for official use only. Allows State or local employees to make such information available to the same extent as Federal employees are so allowed.

Requires the Administrator to ensure that all risk management plans are publicly available in paper or electronic form for inspection, but not copying, during normal business hours. Permits such plans to be available in electronic form only if such form does not provide an electronic means of ranking stationary sources based on off-site consequence analysis information. Authorizes appropriations.

Permits the Administrator to make such information publicly available in an electronic form that excludes information concerning the identity or location of the sources for which the information was submitted. Prohibits Federal, State, or local government employees from making such information publicly available in such form except as authorized by the Administrator.

Imposes criminal penalties on Federal, State, or local government employees who knowingly violate a restriction or prohibition established by this Act.

Permits the Administrator to collect and maintain records that reflect the identity of persons seeking access to information under this Act only to the extent that such actions are relevant and necessary to accomplish an EPA purpose required to be accomplished by statute or executive order. Prescribes a parallel provision for records collected by State or local agencies.

Permits off-site consequence analysis information to be available in any form for official use of Federal contractors. Makes contractors subject to the same restrictions and sanctions applicable to Federal employees under this Act. Sets forth parallel provisions regarding State and local government contractors.

Authorizes the Administrator to withhold, or prevent the release of, off-site consequence analysis information if the release may present an imminent and substantial endangerment to human health or welfare or the environment.

(Sec. 3) Permits the Attorney General, subject to the availability of appropriations, to review industry practices regarding site security and the effectiveness of this Act. Authorizes the Attorney General to submit periodic recommendations to Congress relating to the enhancement of site security practices and the need for continued implementation or modification of this Act.