Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 05/13/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/24/1999
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/01/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/13/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/27/2000