There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Death in Custody Reporting Act of 2000

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Death in Custody Reporting Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994 to ensure that certain information regarding prisoners is reported to the Attorney General.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/13/2000Became Public Law No: 106-297. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2000Signed by President.
10/05/2000Presented to President.
10/03/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/2000Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9769-9770)
07/24/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6736)
05/13/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/13/2000Became Public Law No: 106-297. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2000Signed by President.
10/05/2000HousePresented to President.
10/04/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/03/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/2000SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9769-9770)
07/25/2000SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
07/24/2000-3:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2000-3:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6736)
07/24/2000-3:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1800.
07/24/2000-3:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6736-6737)
07/24/2000-3:09pmHouseMr. Hutchinson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/21/1999HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/13/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/13/1999HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/13/1999

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/13/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime05/21/1999 Referred to
Senate Judiciary07/25/2000 Referred to
10/03/2000 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1800.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1800. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/24/2000)

Death in Custody Reporting Act of 2000 - Amends the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994 to provide that in order for a State to be eligible to receive a Truth-in- Sentencing incentive grant, its grant application must include assurances that the State will follow the guidelines established by the Attorney General in reporting, on a quarterly basis, information regarding the death of any person who is in the process of arrest, is en route to be incarcerated, or is incarcerated at any municipal or county jail, State prison, or other local or State correctional facility (including any juvenile facility), including: (1) the name, gender, race, ethnicity, and age of the deceased; (2) the date, time, and location of death; and (3) a brief description of the circumstances surrounding the death.