Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/13/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 05/13/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/13/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/22/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/22/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/22/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/26/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/26/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/26/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/13/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/13/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/13/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 10/13/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/13/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/09/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/10/1999