Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/14/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/14/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/14/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/20/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/20/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/20/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/27/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/27/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/07/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/14/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/14/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/22/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/29/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/12/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/12/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/16/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/22/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/27/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/29/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/29/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/07/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/10/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/14/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 02/29/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/08/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/16/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/30/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/15/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/18/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/15/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/27/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/27/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/13/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/17/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/18/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/27/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/06/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/18/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/19/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/10/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/10/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/19/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/19/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/24/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew