Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/17/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/17/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/03/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/22/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/28/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/03/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew