Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/20/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/20/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/20/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/20/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/20/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/20/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/24/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/24/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/08/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/08/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/08/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/08/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/08/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/17/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/17/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/17/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/17/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/17/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/17/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/17/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/17/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/17/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/18/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/30/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/30/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/30/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/30/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/30/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/30/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/13/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/13/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/16/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/16/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/16/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/26/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/26/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/30/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/30/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/30/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/30/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/05/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/09/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/21/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/27/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/27/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/27/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/14/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/21/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/21/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/21/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/21/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/01/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/01/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/05/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/16/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/29/2000