Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/08/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/22/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/22/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/22/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/27/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/27/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/29/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/03/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/03/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 08/03/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/04/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/04/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/14/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/14/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/14/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/14/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/14/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/14/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/14/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/14/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/14/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/14/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/14/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/14/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/27/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/27/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/13/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/13/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/13/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/13/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/19/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/19/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/21/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/25/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/25/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/28/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/03/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/03/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/17/1999