Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/26/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/07/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/07/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/07/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/01/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/20/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/20/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/27/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/20/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/26/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/26/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/02/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/02/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/05/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/27/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/27/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/10/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/14/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/29/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/23/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/16/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/08/2000