There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sugar Program Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Agricultural Market Transition Act to convert the price support program for sugarcane and sugar beets into a system of solely recourse loans and to provide for the gradual elimination of the program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/18/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/25/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Risk Management, Research and Specialty Crops.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/18/1999Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/18/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E991)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/18/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/18/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/25/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/25/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/08/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/16/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/19/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/19/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/20/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/05/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/03/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/25/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/24/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/27/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/18/1999 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Risk Management, Research and Specialty Crops05/25/1999 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1850. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/18/1999)

Sugar Program Reform Act - Amends the Agricultural Market Transition Act with respect to the sugar program to: (1) reduce sugarcane loan rates through crop year 2002; (2) revise the sugar beet loan rate; (3) eliminate nonrecourse loans; and (4) eliminate sugar price supports after crop year 2002.

Amends the Agricultural Adjustment Act of 1938 to repeal sugar and crystalline fructose marketing quota and allotment provisions.

Amends the Food Security Act of 1985, beginning after the 1998- 1999 quota year, to direct the President to use all available authority to ensure that U.S. market raw sugar shall be available at not more than the higher of the world sugar price or the U.S. loan rate.