Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/18/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 05/18/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/25/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/25/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/08/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/16/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/19/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/19/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/20/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/05/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/03/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/25/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/24/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/27/2000