Committees: H.R.1858 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce05/19/1999 Referred to
08/05/1999 Markup by
09/30/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-350
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection06/08/1999 Referred to
06/15/1999 Hearings by
07/29/1999 Markup by
07/29/1999 Reported by
House Commerce Subcommittee on Finance and Hazardous Materials06/08/1999 Referred to
06/30/1999 Hearings by
07/21/1999 Markup by
07/21/1999 Reported by
House Judiciary09/30/1999 Referred to
10/08/1999 Discharged from