Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/19/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 05/19/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 05/19/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/14/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/14/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/16/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/01/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/13/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/18/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/18/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/26/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/28/1999