Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 05/19/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/21/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/21/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/21/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/21/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/30/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/30/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/18/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/18/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/18/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/18/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/18/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/10/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/10/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/16/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/29/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/29/2000