Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/20/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/20/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/20/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/20/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/20/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/22/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/13/1999