Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/24/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/14/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/14/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/17/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/29/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/29/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/12/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/12/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/12/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/13/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/13/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/14/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/15/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/19/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/19/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/20/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/20/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/20/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/20/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/21/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/21/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/21/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/22/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/22/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/26/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/29/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/29/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/30/1999