There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Sudbury, Assabet, and Concord Wild and Scenic River Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sudbury, Assabet, and Concord Wild and Scenic River Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate a portion of the Sudbury, Assabet, and Concord Rivers as a component of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
04/09/1999Became Public Law No: 106-20. (TXT | PDF)
04/09/1999Signed by President.
03/31/1999Presented to President.
03/25/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3568, S3572-3573; text: CR S3572-3573)
03/17/1999Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 106-25.
02/23/1999Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 22 (Roll no. 23).(text: CR H679)
02/08/1999Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-10.
01/06/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/09/1999Became Public Law No: 106-20. (TXT | PDF)
04/09/1999Signed by President.
03/31/1999HousePresented to President.
03/26/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/25/1999SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3568, S3572-3573; text: CR S3572-3573)
03/17/1999SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 52.
03/17/1999SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 106-25.
03/04/1999SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/25/1999SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
02/24/1999SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/23/1999-4:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/23/1999-4:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 22 (Roll no. 23). (text: CR H679)
02/23/1999-3:47pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H679)
02/23/1999-2:30pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/23/1999-2:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
02/23/1999-2:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H670-671)
02/23/1999-2:22pmHouseMr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/08/1999HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 9.
02/08/1999HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-10.
02/03/1999HouseSubcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands Discharged.
02/03/1999HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Resources
02/03/1999HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/12/1999HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
01/12/1999HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/06/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
01/06/1999HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources01/06/1999 Referred to
02/03/1999 Markup by
02/08/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-10
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands01/12/1999 Referred to
02/03/1999 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/24/1999 Referred to
03/04/1999 Markup by
03/17/1999 Reported by S. Rept. 106-25
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation and Recreation02/25/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.193.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.193. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/23/1999)

Sudbury, Assabet, and Concord Wild and Scenic River Act - Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate segments of the Sudbury, Assabet, and Concord Rivers in Massachusetts as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.

Requires the segments to be: (1) administered by the Secretary of the Interior through cooperative agreements between the Secretary and the Commonwealth of Massachusetts and its relevant political subdivisions; and (2) managed in accordance with the Sudbury, Assabet, and Concord Wild and Scenic River Study, River Conservation Plan which shall be deemed to satisfy the requirement for a comprehensive management plan pursuant to the Act.

Requires the Director of the National Park Service to represent the Secretary in the implementation of the Conservation Plan and the provisions of the Act with respect to the segments. Authorizes the Director to provide technical assistance, staff support, and limited funding to assist in the implementation of the Plan.

Authorizes appropriations.