Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/30/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/13/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/22/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/30/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/30/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/02/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 08/03/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 08/04/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/04/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 08/04/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/04/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/04/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/08/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/09/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/13/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/22/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/14/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/14/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/01/2000