Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/13/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/04/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/04/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/14/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/12/2000