Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/27/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/29/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/29/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/01/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/01/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 10/01/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/01/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/01/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/01/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/01/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/01/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/01/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 10/01/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/01/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/05/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/05/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/05/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/05/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/05/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/05/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/05/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/05/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/07/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/07/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/07/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/07/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/07/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/07/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/07/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/07/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/07/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/14/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/14/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/14/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/14/1999