Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/18/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/18/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/18/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/22/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/30/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/12/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/16/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/16/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/19/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/30/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/30/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/03/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/03/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/14/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/29/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/29/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/07/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/07/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/02/2000