Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/27/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/27/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/27/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/10/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/10/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/10/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/10/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/15/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/16/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/17/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/18/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/26/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/29/1999