Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/29/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/29/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/29/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/29/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/20/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/20/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/20/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/20/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/20/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/20/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/20/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/10/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/10/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/10/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/10/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/18/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/08/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/08/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/08/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/08/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/08/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/23/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/23/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/23/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/23/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/23/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/18/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/18/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/24/2000