Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/25/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/25/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/25/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/25/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/25/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/25/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/25/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/25/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/01/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/22/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/22/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/22/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/26/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/26/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/26/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/29/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 08/05/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/05/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 08/05/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/14/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/14/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/14/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/14/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/14/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/14/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/14/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/14/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/14/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/14/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/14/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/14/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/14/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/23/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/23/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/03/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/03/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/31/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/14/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/23/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/23/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/23/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/23/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/23/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/23/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/23/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/23/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/23/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/12/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/12/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/12/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/12/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/13/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/09/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/09/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/17/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/24/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/24/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/12/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/10/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/19/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/28/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/03/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/17/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/24/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/25/2000