Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/07/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/07/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/14/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/01/1999