Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/07/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/07/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/07/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/09/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/15/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/15/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/18/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/18/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/18/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/18/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/18/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/24/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/24/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/01/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/16/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/22/1999