Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/22/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/13/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/13/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/13/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/13/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/13/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/13/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/13/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/23/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/23/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/23/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/14/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/14/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/14/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/01/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/01/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/01/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/01/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/06/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/06/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/16/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/11/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/14/2000