Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/24/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/24/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/15/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/15/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/15/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/15/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/15/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/15/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/29/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/29/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/02/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/07/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/07/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/07/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/14/2000