Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/09/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/09/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/09/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/09/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/09/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/15/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 06/30/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 08/05/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/09/2000