Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/18/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/18/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/18/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/18/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/30/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/30/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/12/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/12/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/12/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/26/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/26/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/26/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/26/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/26/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/02/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/02/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/02/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/08/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/08/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/15/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/15/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/15/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/22/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/22/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/22/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/22/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/22/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/05/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/05/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/05/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/05/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/07/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/07/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/07/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/26/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/26/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 01/27/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 01/27/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/10/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/16/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/16/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/29/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 02/29/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/29/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/15/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/15/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/21/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/21/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/21/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/23/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/23/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/11/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/11/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/11/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/11/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/03/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/09/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/19/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/22/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/22/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/22/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/26/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/26/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/29/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/13/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/13/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/18/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/18/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/18/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/18/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/20/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/20/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/26/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/26/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/26/2000