Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/10/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/15/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/15/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/15/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/15/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/15/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/15/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/13/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/13/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/13/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/30/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/30/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/27/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/07/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/10/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/15/2000