Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/01/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/01/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/22/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/09/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/09/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/18/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/18/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/16/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/19/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/19/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/22/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 02/10/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/10/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/29/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/29/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/29/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/28/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/28/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/11/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/25/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/25/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/15/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/15/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/11/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/11/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/14/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/14/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/21/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/21/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/21/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/21/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/28/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/28/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/28/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/28/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/03/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/03/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/05/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/05/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/05/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/05/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/05/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/05/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/11/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/11/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/11/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/11/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/19/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/19/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/19/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/19/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/19/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/25/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/25/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/26/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/26/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/02/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/02/2000