Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/24/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/13/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/13/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/13/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/13/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/29/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/29/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/29/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/13/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/13/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/13/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/13/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/13/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/22/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/22/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/13/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/13/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/13/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/13/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/01/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/01/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/17/1999