Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/10/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/22/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/30/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/21/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/28/2000