Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/08/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/08/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/08/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/08/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/08/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/08/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/08/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/08/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/08/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/08/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/08/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/08/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/08/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/08/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/08/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/08/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/08/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/08/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/08/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/08/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/08/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/08/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/08/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/08/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/08/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/08/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/08/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/08/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/11/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/23/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/23/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/23/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/18/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/13/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/15/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/15/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/05/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/05/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/11/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/11/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/25/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/25/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/25/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/08/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/15/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/20/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/20/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/07/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/17/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/09/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/29/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/29/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/08/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/15/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/15/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/15/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/16/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/27/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/27/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/27/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/03/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/03/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/05/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/10/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/25/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/25/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/10/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/26/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/06/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/12/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/26/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 10/17/2000