Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/29/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/01/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/12/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/12/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/12/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/20/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/20/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/20/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/20/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/26/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/26/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/08/1999