Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 01/19/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/19/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/19/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/10/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/11/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/12/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/23/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/24/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/04/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew