Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/30/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/30/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/14/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/26/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/26/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/29/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 08/03/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/05/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/13/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/13/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/07/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/01/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/30/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/02/2000