Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/17/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/17/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/29/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/29/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/13/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/13/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/29/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/24/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/05/1999