Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/16/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/17/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/23/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/23/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/23/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/13/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/16/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/16/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/16/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/16/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/20/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/20/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/20/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/20/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/20/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/20/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/27/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/29/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/29/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/29/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 08/03/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/03/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/05/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/09/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/09/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/09/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/09/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/21/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/21/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/28/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/04/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/04/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/04/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/05/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/05/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/05/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/05/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/14/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/14/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/14/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/19/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/19/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/28/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/09/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/02/2000