Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/23/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/08/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/23/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/23/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/06/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/06/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/19/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/10/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/17/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/08/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/08/2000