Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/16/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/16/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/01/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 07/01/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/01/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/01/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/01/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/01/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/26/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 08/03/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/28/1999