There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Arctic Coastal Plain Domestic Energy Security Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish and implement a competitive oil and gas leasing program that will result in an environmentally sound and job creating program for the exploration, development, and production of the oil and gas resources of Coastal Plain, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/16/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/29/1999Referred to Department of the Interior for comments.
Action By: Committee on Resources
06/17/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1299-1300)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/1999Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/13/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/09/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/09/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/09/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/28/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources06/16/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2250.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2250. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/16/1999)

Arctic Coastal Plain Domestic Energy Security Act of 1999 - Declares that: (1) it is the policy of the United States to permit exploration, development, production and transportation of oil and gas resources in a designated area of the Coastal Plain Study Area of the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge; (2) such exploration, development, production and transportation should proceed with dispatch; and (3) such activities should be conducted in a manner consistent with the protection of the Coastal Plain's fish and wildlife resources and environment and the needs of the area's subsistence users.

(Sec. 4) Instructs the Secretary of the Interior to establish and implement a competitive oil and gas leasing program that will: (1) result in an environmentally sound program; (2) not result in significant adverse effects upon fish and wildlife; and (3) ensure the receipt of fair market value by the public for the mineral resources to be leased.

Amends the Alaska National Interest Lands Conservation Act of 1980 to repeal the prohibition against production of oil and gas from the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge, and any leasing or development leading to such production.

States that Congress determines that the Coastal Plain oil and gas leasing program and activities authorized by this Act are compatible with the purposes for which the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge was established, and that no further findings or decisions are required to implement this determination.

States this Act is the sole authority for Coastal Plain leasing, and that such Plain is considered "Federal land" for purposes of the Federal Oil and Gas Royalty Management Act of 1982.

Authorizes the Secretary to: (1) designate a maximum total of Coastal Plain acreage as "Special Areas" and close them to leasing if the Secretary determines that these Areas require special management and regulatory protection; (2) permit leasing in those Special Areas by setting lease terms that limit or condition surface use and occupancy by lessees but permit the use of horizontal drilling technology from sites on leases located outside the designated Special Areas. Declares that this Act constitutes the Secretary's sole authority to close Coastal Plain lands to oil and gas leasing and to exploration, development, and production.

(Sec. 6) States that lands may be leased to any person qualified to obtain a lease for oil and gas deposits under the Mineral Leasing Act. Requires the Secretary to prescribe lease procedures.

(Sec. 7) Authorizes the Secretary to grant to the highest responsible qualified bidder by sealed competitive cash bonus bid any Coastal Plain lands upon payment of such bonus and a royalty which shall not be less than a certain amount. Prescribes lease terms and conditions.

(Sec. 10) Directs the Secretary to grant rights-of-way and easements across the Coastal Plain for oil and gas transportation.