Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/17/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/17/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/17/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/17/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/18/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/22/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/22/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/23/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/23/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/24/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/24/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/25/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/29/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/29/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/30/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/30/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/30/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/30/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/01/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/01/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/01/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/01/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/01/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/13/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/13/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/13/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/15/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/21/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/27/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/03/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 08/03/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/03/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/03/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/05/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/30/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/06/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/13/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/18/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/18/1999