Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/17/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/22/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/22/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/22/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/22/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/22/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/24/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/24/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/24/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/30/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/30/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/30/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/30/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/13/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/13/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/13/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/19/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/19/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/26/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/26/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/29/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/30/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/30/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/02/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/02/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/22/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/22/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/22/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/22/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/22/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/22/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/30/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/30/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/30/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/10/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/15/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/16/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/14/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/23/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/28/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/28/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/04/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/14/2000