Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/18/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/18/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/18/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/18/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/18/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/18/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/29/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/01/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/12/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/12/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/12/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/14/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/21/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/22/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/30/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/07/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/27/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/16/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/22/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/01/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/30/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/13/2000