Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/22/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/22/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/22/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/22/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 06/22/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/23/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/23/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/23/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/23/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/23/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/23/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/23/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/23/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/23/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/29/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/29/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/29/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/29/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/01/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/12/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/12/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/12/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/12/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/12/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/12/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/12/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/12/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/12/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/21/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/21/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/21/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/01/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/01/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/01/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/01/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/01/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/07/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/07/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/13/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/14/1999