Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/20/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/22/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/22/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/22/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/22/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/26/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/26/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/26/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/27/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/27/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/27/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/30/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/30/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 08/05/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/05/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/09/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/09/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/13/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/14/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/14/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/29/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/14/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/14/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/14/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/28/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/03/1999